NE LR210 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-26 - Notice of hearing for September 22, 2017
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-26 - Notice of hearing for September 22, 2017
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine fiscal distress among local political subdivisions in Nebraska and how the Legislature could establish an early warning system to identify and respond to such fiscal distress
Title
Interim study to examine fiscal distress among local political subdivisions in Nebraska and how the Legislature could establish an early warning system to identify and respond to such fiscal distress
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 22, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33680 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR210.pdf |