NE LR21 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover resolution
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover resolution
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a special committee of the Legislature to be known as the Small Modular Nuclear Reactor Study Committee
Title
Provide for a special committee of the Legislature to be known as the Small Modular Nuclear Reactor Study Committee
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution |
2023-03-13 | Legislature | Executive Board AM478 filed |
2023-03-13 | Legislature | Reported to the Legislature for further consideration with AM478 |
2023-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 24, 2023 |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2023-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to the Reference Committee |
2023-01-13 | Legislature | Correction |
2023-01-12 | Legislature | Laid over |
2023-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |