NE LR209 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-21 - Notice of hearing for November 15, 2019
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-21 - Notice of hearing for November 15, 2019
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine state and federal funding options for existing and potential research by the University of Nebraska on local, state, and global water management systems
Title
Interim study to examine state and federal funding options for existing and potential research by the University of Nebraska on local, state, and global water management systems
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for November 15, 2019 |
2019-08-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 27, 2019 (cancel) |
2019-06-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 27, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40447 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR209.pdf |