NE LR206 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-19 - Notice of hearing for September 13, 2019
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-19 - Notice of hearing for September 13, 2019
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine options for the elimination of cash bail, appearance bonds, and related provisions, and examine risk assessment tools for pretrial release, post-conviction custody, and supervision status determinations
Title
Interim study to examine options for the elimination of cash bail, appearance bonds, and related provisions, and examine risk assessment tools for pretrial release, post-conviction custody, and supervision status determinations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 13, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=39687 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR206.pdf |