NE LR206 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-25 - Notice of hearing for November 07, 2011
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-25 - Notice of hearing for November 07, 2011
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine funding streams available to adult education programs to better transition adults into postsecondary education through bridge programs
Title
Interim study to examine funding streams available to adult education programs to better transition adults into postsecondary education through bridge programs
Sponsors
Sen. Heath Mello [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-25 | Notice of hearing for November 07, 2011 | |
2011-05-23 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Executive Board | |
2011-05-09 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=14694 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR206.pdf |