NE LR2 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Notice of hearing for February 06, 2019
Pending: Legislature Executive Board Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Rescind any previous resolutions calling for U.S. Constitution Article V conventions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rescind any previous resolutions calling for U.S. Constitution Article V conventions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 06, 2019
2019-01-14LegislatureReferred to Executive Board
2019-01-10LegislatureSpeaker's announcement
2019-01-10LegislatureLaid over
2019-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback