NE LR19CA | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 8 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 8 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to provide that a civil officer is liable to impeachment for misdemeanors in pursuit of office
Title
Constitutional amendment to provide that a civil officer is liable to impeachment for misdemeanors in pursuit of office
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Avery [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-03-01 | Presented to Secretary of State on March 01, 2012 | |
2012-03-01 | President/Speaker signed | |
2012-03-01 | Passed on Final Reading for general election 45-0-4 | |
2012-02-13 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2012-02-08 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2012-02-08 | Enrollment and Review ER153 adopted | |
2012-01-27 | Enrollment and Review ER153 filed | |
2012-01-27 | Placed on Select File with ER153 | |
2012-01-26 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2012-01-26 | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM866 adopted | |
2012-01-25 | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM866 pending | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover resolution | |
2011-03-22 | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM866 filed | |
2011-03-22 | Placed on General File with AM866 | |
2011-02-16 | Notice of hearing for March 04, 2011 | |
2011-01-12 | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Date of introduction |