NE LR156 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-25 - Notice of hearing for September 29, 2023
Pending: Legislature Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-25 - Notice of hearing for September 29, 2023
Pending: Legislature Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the firefighting response to wildfires in Nebraska
Title
Interim study to examine the firefighting response to wildfires in Nebraska
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 29, 2023 |
2023-05-23 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2023-05-17 | Legislature | DeBoer name added |
2023-05-11 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2023-05-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=53805 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Intro/LR156.pdf |