NE LR13CA | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to limit the percentage of funding for schools that comes from property taxes
Title
Constitutional amendment to limit the percentage of funding for schools that comes from property taxes
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution |
2021-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2021 |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Briese name added |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |