NE LR136 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-07 - Notice of hearing for October 29, 2021
Pending: Legislature Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-07 - Notice of hearing for October 29, 2021
Pending: Legislature Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine and evaluate the causes, costs, and impacts of rolling electrical power outages during the extreme weather events of February 2021
Title
Interim study to examine and evaluate the causes, costs, and impacts of rolling electrical power outages during the extreme weather events of February 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 29, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2021-05-11 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2021-05-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=46179 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Intro/LR136.pdf |