NE LR123 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Endorse the proposition that Taiwan participate in the International Civil Aviation Organization as an observer
Title
Endorse the proposition that Taiwan participate in the International Civil Aviation Organization as an observer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover resolution | |
2011-03-24 | Notice of hearing for April 05, 2011 | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2011-03-15 | Speaker's announcement | |
2011-03-15 | Laid over | |
2011-03-15 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=13804 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR123.pdf |