NE LR10CA | 2024 | 108th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-31 - Notice of hearing for August 03, 2024
Pending: Legislature Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-31 - Notice of hearing for August 03, 2024
Pending: Legislature Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to authorize suits against political subdivisions for changing tax policies that directly result in net increased tax revenue without voter approval at a general election
Title
Constitutional amendment to authorize suits against political subdivisions for changing tax policies that directly result in net increased tax revenue without voter approval at a general election
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Slama [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for August 03, 2024 |
2024-07-30 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2024-07-29 | Legislature | Date of introduction |