NE LB999 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor on April 14, 2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor on April 14, 2010
Summary
Provide a moratorium on new hospital licenses and a study on health care
Title
Provide a moratorium on new hospital licenses and a study on health care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Approved by Governor on April 14, 2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Presented to Governor on April 13, 2010 | |
2010-04-13 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-04-13 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 41-6-2 | |
2010-04-09 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2010-04-09 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-04-09 | Enrollment and Review ER8238 adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Enrollment and Review ER8238 filed | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on Select File with ER8238 | |
2010-04-07 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-04-07 | Carlson AM2362 withdrawn | |
2010-04-07 | Lautenbaugh AM2357 withdrawn | |
2010-04-07 | McCoy AM2359 withdrawn | |
2010-04-07 | Karpisek AM2360 withdrawn | |
2010-04-07 | Conrad AM2361 withdrawn | |
2010-04-07 | Gay AM2363 withdrawn | |
2010-04-07 | Hansen AM2280 withdrawn | |
2010-04-07 | Cornett AM2374 withdrawn | |
2010-04-07 | Conrad AM2393 withdrawn | |
2010-04-07 | Carlson AM2394 withdrawn | |
2010-04-07 | Karpisek AM2396 withdrawn | |
2010-04-07 | Karpisek AM2392 withdrawn | |
2010-04-07 | McCoy AM2391 withdrawn | |
2010-04-07 | Cornett AM2397 withdrawn | |
2010-04-07 | Cornett AM2389 withdrawn | |
2010-04-07 | Hansen AM2400 withdrawn | |
2010-04-07 | Gay AM2399 withdrawn | |
2010-04-07 | Gay AM2395 withdrawn | |
2010-04-07 | Campbell AM2503 adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Campbell AM2366 withdrawn | |
2010-04-07 | Campbell AM2321 withdrawn | |
2010-04-06 | Campbell AM2503 filed | |
2010-03-29 | Karpisek AM2396 filed | |
2010-03-29 | Gay AM2399 filed | |
2010-03-29 | Conrad AM2393 filed | |
2010-03-29 | Carlson AM2394 filed | |
2010-03-29 | Cornett AM2397 filed | |
2010-03-29 | Karpisek AM2392 filed | |
2010-03-29 | McCoy AM2391 filed | |
2010-03-29 | Rogert name added | |
2010-03-29 | Cornett AM2389 filed | |
2010-03-29 | Hansen AM2400 filed | |
2010-03-29 | Gay AM2395 filed | |
2010-03-29 | Carlson AM2362 filed | |
2010-03-26 | Lautenbaugh AM2357 filed | |
2010-03-26 | McCoy AM2359 filed | |
2010-03-26 | Karpisek AM2360 filed | |
2010-03-26 | Conrad AM2361 filed | |
2010-03-26 | Gay AM2363 filed | |
2010-03-26 | Hansen AM2280 filed | |
2010-03-26 | Cornett AM2374 filed | |
2010-03-26 | Campbell AM2366 filed | |
2010-03-25 | Campbell AM2321 filed | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on General File | |
2010-02-19 | Campbell priority bill | |
2010-02-17 | Notice of hearing for February 24, 2010 | |
2010-01-22 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=10105 |