NE LB998 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1034 amended into LB998 by AM2460
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1034 amended into LB998 by AM2460
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to disposition of human remains, offenses related to the person, sexual exploitation, labor and sex trafficking, the Sex Offender Registration Act, and driving under the influence
Title
Change provisions relating to disposition of human remains, offenses related to the person, sexual exploitation, labor and sex trafficking, the Sex Offender Registration Act, and driving under the influence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1034 amended into LB998 by AM2460 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB933 amended into LB998 by AM2459 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB795 amended into LB998 by AM2277 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB441 amended into LB998 by AM2656 |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 09, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 03, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2014-04-01 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST78 |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Seiler AM2656 adopted |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Seiler AM2656 filed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Seiler MO164 prevailed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Seiler MO164 Permit consideration of AM2656 filed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | McGill AM2459 adopted |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | McGill MO160 prevailed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | McGill MO160 Permit consideration of AM2459 filed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | McGill AM2460 adopted |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | McGill MO159 prevailed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Janssen MO165 prevailed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Janssen MO165 Reconsider the vote taken to suspend the germaneness rule to consider AM2460 filed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | McGill MO159 failed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | McGill MO159 Permit consideration of AM2460 filed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Harr AM2277 adopted |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER185 adopted |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | McGill AM2459 filed |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | McGill AM2460 filed |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Harr AM2277 filed |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER185 filed |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER185 |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2079 adopted |
2014-03-13 | Legislature | Hadley name added |
2014-02-25 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2079 filed |
2014-02-25 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2079 |
2014-02-20 | Legislature | Karpisek priority bill |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2014 |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2014-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |