NE LB998 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Foster Care Review Office and eliminate the State Foster Care Review Board
Title
Create the Foster Care Review Office and eliminate the State Foster Care Review Board
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | Presented to Governor on April 05, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | President/Speaker signed | |
2012-04-05 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 | |
2012-04-05 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2012-03-30 | Placed on Final Reading with ST80 | |
2012-03-28 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2012-03-28 | Krist AM2658 adopted | |
2012-03-28 | Krist AM2658 filed | |
2012-03-28 | Sullivan AM2625 adopted | |
2012-03-28 | Sullivan AM2625 filed | |
2012-03-28 | Krist AM2522 adopted | |
2012-03-28 | Enrollment and Review ER208 adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Krist AM2522 filed | |
2012-03-13 | Enrollment and Review ER208 filed | |
2012-03-13 | Placed on Select File with ER208 | |
2012-03-07 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2012-03-07 | Krist AM2332 adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Krist AM2332 pending | |
2012-03-07 | Krist AM2279 withdrawn | |
2012-03-07 | Health and Human Services AM2041 adopted | |
2012-03-06 | Krist AM2332 filed | |
2012-03-05 | Krist AM2279 filed | |
2012-02-24 | Health and Human Services AM2041 filed | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on General File with AM2041 | |
2012-02-15 | Krist priority bill | |
2012-01-30 | Seiler name added | |
2012-01-30 | Karpisek name added | |
2012-01-30 | Hadley name added | |
2012-01-25 | Schumacher name added | |
2012-01-25 | Harr name added | |
2012-01-25 | Harms name added | |
2012-01-25 | Bloomfield name added | |
2012-01-24 | Howard name added | |
2012-01-24 | Mello name added | |
2012-01-20 | Wallman name added | |
2012-01-20 | Schilz name added | |
2012-01-20 | Hansen name added | |
2012-01-20 | Christensen name added | |
2012-01-20 | Carlson name added | |
2012-01-20 | Campbell name added | |
2012-01-19 | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2012 | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Date of introduction |