NE LB993 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Add, change, and eliminate provisions relating to 911 service system planning and funding
Title
Add, change, and eliminate provisions relating to 911 service system planning and funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018 |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 29, 2018 |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Friesen AM2385 adopted |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER126 adopted |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Friesen AM2385 filed |
2018-03-12 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER126 filed |
2018-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER126 |
2018-03-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-03-09 | Legislature | Friesen AM2323 adopted |
2018-03-09 | Legislature | Friesen AM2323 filed |
2018-03-09 | Legislature | Hilgers AM2325 withdrawn |
2018-03-09 | Legislature | Hilgers AM2325 filed |
2018-03-09 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1908 adopted |
2018-03-08 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1908 pending |
2018-02-23 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1908 filed |
2018-02-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1908 |
2018-02-21 | Legislature | Geist name added |
2018-02-13 | Legislature | Geist priority bill |
2018-02-02 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2018 |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2018-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |