NE LB993 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to child abuse and neglect teams and child advocacy centers
Title
Change provisions relating to child abuse and neglect teams and child advocacy centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | Presented to Governor on April 05, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | President/Speaker signed | |
2012-04-05 | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 | |
2012-03-29 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2012-03-27 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2012-03-27 | Enrollment and Review ER190 adopted | |
2012-02-28 | Enrollment and Review ER190 filed | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on Select File with ER190 | |
2012-02-27 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2012-02-27 | Council AM2113 withdrawn | |
2012-02-27 | Council AM2110 withdrawn | |
2012-02-22 | Council AM2113 filed | |
2012-02-22 | Council AM2110 filed | |
2012-02-16 | Howard priority bill | |
2012-02-16 | Placed on General File | |
2012-02-03 | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2012 (reschedule) | |
2012-02-03 | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2012 (cancel) | |
2012-02-02 | Flood motion to suspend rules to permit cancellation of hearing prevailed | |
2012-01-25 | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2012 | |
2012-01-17 | Council name added | |
2012-01-17 | Krist name added | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-01-12 | Date of introduction |