NE LB990A | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-0-8 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 41-0-8 |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |