NE LB989 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Approved by Governor on April 23, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Approved by Governor on April 23, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize automated-driving-system-equipped vehicles, automated driving systems, and driverless-capable vehicles as prescribed
Title
Authorize automated-driving-system-equipped vehicles, automated driving systems, and driverless-capable vehicles as prescribed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 34-8-7 |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Morfeld name added |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST69 |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Wishart AM2907 adopted |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Wishart AM2907 filed |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Blood AM2865 withdrawn |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Friesen AM2892 withdrawn |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Wishart AM2896 withdrawn |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Smith AM2894 withdrawn |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER182 adopted |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER182 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER182 |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Blood AM2865 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM2612 adopted |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Wishart MO340 prevailed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Wishart MO340 Invoke cloture filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Smith AM2899 adopted |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Smith AM2890 withdrawn |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Smith MO339 withdrawn |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Friesen objection to unanimous consent to request to substitute amendment withdrawn |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Smith MO339 pending |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Smith MO339 Substitute AM2899 for AM2890 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Friesen objected to unanimous consent to request to substitute amendment |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Smith AM2899 pending |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Smith AM2899 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Smith AM2890 pending |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Smith AM2890 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Friesen MO338 failed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Friesen MO338 Permit consideration of AM2879 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Friesen AM2879 pending |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Friesen MO337 failed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Friesen MO337 Substitute AM2892 for AM2879 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Wishart objected to unanimous consent to request to substitute amendment |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Friesen AM2892 pending |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Friesen AM2892 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Friesen AM2879 pending |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Friesen AM2879 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Friesen AM2881 lost |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Friesen AM2881 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Friesen AM2828 withdrawn |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Friesen MO324 failed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Wishart AM2896 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Smith AM2894 filed |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | Larson name added |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Friesen AM2828 filed |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Friesen MO324 Recommit to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee filed |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Larson AM2787 adopted |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Friesen MO323 failed |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Friesen MO323 pending |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Friesen MO323 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Larson AM2787 pending |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Larson AM2787 filed |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM2612 pending |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM2612 filed |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2612 |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Wishart priority bill |
2018-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2018 |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Geist name added |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Hansen name added |
2018-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |