NE LB983 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to audiovisual court appearances
Title
Change provisions relating to audiovisual court appearances
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Ebke [N] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Thibodeau explanation of vote |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2018-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2018 |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |