NE LB981 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate funds for renovation of certain living units at the Youth Rehabilitation and Treatment Center-Kearney
Title
Appropriate funds for renovation of certain living units at the Youth Rehabilitation and Treatment Center-Kearney
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-25 | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2012 | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-01-12 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=15972 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB981.pdf |