NE LB978 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit sales of alcohol or beer for consumption off the premises at less than cost
Title
Prohibit sales of alcohol or beer for consumption off the premises at less than cost
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-30 | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2012 | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to General Affairs Committee | |
2012-01-12 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=15879 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB978.pdf |