NE LB978 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor on April 12, 2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor on April 12, 2010
Summary
Provide requirements relating to energy star certified appliances in the state's competitive bidding process
Title
Provide requirements relating to energy star certified appliances in the state's competitive bidding process
Sponsors
Sen. Heath Mello [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by Governor on April 12, 2010 | |
2010-04-12 | Nordquist explanation of vote | |
2010-04-12 | Presented to Governor on April 09, 2010 | |
2010-04-09 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-04-09 | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2010-04-06 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on Select File | |
2010-03-31 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-02-16 | Placed on General File | |
2010-01-27 | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2010 | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=10132 |