NE LB972 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Approved by Governor on April 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Approved by Governor on April 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to youth rehabilitation and treatment centers
Title
Change provisions relating to youth rehabilitation and treatment centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Approved by Governor on April 10, 2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Presented to Governor on April 04, 2012 | |
2012-04-04 | President/Speaker signed | |
2012-04-04 | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 | |
2012-04-04 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2012-04-02 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2012-04-02 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2012-04-02 | Enrollment and Review ER261 adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Enrollment and Review ER261 filed | |
2012-03-30 | Placed on Select File with ER261 | |
2012-03-28 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2012-03-28 | Judiciary AM2598 adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Judiciary AM2598 filed | |
2012-03-22 | Placed on General File with AM2598 | |
2012-02-15 | Judiciary priority bill | |
2012-01-18 | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2012 | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-01-12 | Date of introduction |