NE LB970 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to pickle cards and keno and authorize methods of payment for gambling
Title
Change provisions relating to pickle cards and keno and authorize methods of payment for gambling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-02-19 | Legislature | Chambers MO187 pending |
2016-02-19 | Legislature | Chambers MO187 Bracket until April 20, 2016 filed |
2016-02-19 | Legislature | General Affairs AM2020 pending |
2016-02-19 | Legislature | Chambers MO186 failed |
2016-02-19 | Legislature | Chambers MO186 Reconsider the vote to indefinitely postpone filed |
2016-02-19 | Legislature | Chambers MO180 failed |
2016-02-19 | Legislature | Chambers MO180 pending |
2016-02-11 | Legislature | Larson AM2101 filed |
2016-02-11 | Legislature | Chambers MO180 pending |
2016-02-11 | Legislature | Chambers MO180 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | General Affairs priority bill |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | General Affairs AM2020 filed |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2020 |
2016-02-01 | Legislature | Larson AM1926 filed |
2016-02-01 | Legislature | Larson AM1925 filed |
2016-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2016 |
2016-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2016-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28885 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB970.pdf |