NE LB969 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB969 amended into LB1370 by AM2863
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB969 amended into LB1370 by AM2863
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to contracts and sealed bids for public power districts
Title
Change provisions relating to contracts and sealed bids for public power districts
Sponsors
Sen. Barry DeKay [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB969 amended into LB1370 by AM2863 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2024 |
2024-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2024-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |