NE LB968 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on January 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on January 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Live Adult Entertainment Establishment Fee Act
Title
Adopt the Live Adult Entertainment Establishment Fee Act
Sponsors
Sen. Barry DeKay [N] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-09 - Legislature - DeKay MO1165 prevailed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Legislature | Bill withdrawn |
2024-01-09 | Legislature | DeKay MO1165 prevailed |
2024-01-08 | Legislature | DeKay MO1165 Withdraw LB968 filed |
2024-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2024-01-05 | Legislature | Conrad name withdrawn |
2024-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |