NE LB968 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Disability Employment and Engagement Program Act
Title
Adopt the Disability Employment and Engagement Program Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2018 |
2018-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34513 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB968.pdf |