NE LB966 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Discretionary Clause Prohibition Act relating to insurance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Discretionary Clause Prohibition Act relating to insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-20LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2022-02-10LegislaturePlaced on General File
2022-01-24LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 01, 2022
2022-01-12LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2022-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback