NE LB957 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for early childhood aid under the Tax Equity and Educational Opportunities Support Act
Title
Provide for early childhood aid under the Tax Equity and Educational Opportunities Support Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 27, 2024 |
2024-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2024-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |