NE LB957 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Approved by Governor on April 19, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Approved by Governor on April 19, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide procedures for choosing a method of payment for payments under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act
Title
Provide procedures for choosing a method of payment for payments under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Lowe [N] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Lowe AM2818 adopted |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Lowe AM2818 filed |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER148 adopted |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER148 filed |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER148 |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | McDonnell AM2673 adopted |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | McDonnell AM2673 filed |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Lowe AM2659 adopted |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Lowe AM2659 filed |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM1952 adopted |
2018-02-22 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM1952 filed |
2018-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1952 |
2018-02-21 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2018 |
2018-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |