NE LB956 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Approved by Governor on April 05, 2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Approved by Governor on April 05, 2010
Summary
Rename the Nebraska Scholarship Act and change award provisions
Title
Rename the Nebraska Scholarship Act and change award provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Adams [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | Approved by Governor on April 05, 2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Krist explanation of vote | |
2010-03-30 | Presented to Governor on March 30, 2010 | |
2010-03-30 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-03-30 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 | |
2010-03-30 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-03-17 | Enrollment and Review ER8187 adopted | |
2010-03-09 | Enrollment and Review ER8187 filed | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on Select File with ER8187 | |
2010-03-04 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-02-22 | Speaker priority bill | |
2010-02-22 | Placed on General File | |
2010-01-25 | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2010 | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Education Committee | |
2010-01-14 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9746 |