NE LB950 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB899 amended into LB950 by AM2087
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB899 amended into LB950 by AM2087
Summary
Change provisions relating to retirement
Title
Change provisions relating to retirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB899 amended into LB950 by AM2087 | |
2010-04-13 | Approved by Governor on April 13, 2010 | |
2010-04-12 | Nordquist explanation of vote | |
2010-04-09 | Flood explanation of vote | |
2010-04-09 | Christensen explanation of vote | |
2010-04-09 | Presented to Governor on April 09, 2010 | |
2010-04-09 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-04-08 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-0-7 | |
2010-04-08 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2010-03-31 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-03-31 | Pankonin AM2353 adopted | |
2010-03-31 | Enrollment and Review ER8219 adopted | |
2010-03-29 | Pankonin AM2353 filed | |
2010-03-25 | Enrollment and Review ER8219 filed | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on Select File with ER8219 | |
2010-03-23 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-03-23 | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM2087 adopted | |
2010-03-12 | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM2087 filed | |
2010-03-12 | Placed on General File with AM2087 | |
2010-02-17 | Nebraska Retirement Systems priority bill | |
2010-01-22 | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2010 | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee | |
2010-01-14 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9907 |