NE LB945 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1002 amended into LB945 by AM1700
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1002 amended into LB945 by AM1700
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create funds and authorize, change, provide, and eliminate fund transfer provisions
Title
Create funds and authorize, change, provide, and eliminate fund transfer provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Scheer [N] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 41-4-4 (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1002 amended into LB945 by AM1700 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB679 amended into LB945 by AM2288 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB538 amended into LB945 by AM1700 |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018 |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 03, 2018 |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 41-4-4 |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Stinner AM2463 adopted |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER128 adopted |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Stinner AM2463 filed |
2018-03-14 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER128 filed |
2018-03-14 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER128 |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Krist AM2288 adopted |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Appropriations AM1700 adopted |
2018-03-09 | Legislature | Krist AM2288 filed |
2018-03-09 | Legislature | Appropriations AM1700 filed |
2018-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1700 |
2018-01-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2018 |
2018-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |