NE LB934 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1008 amended into LB934 by AM2190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provide a penalty for exploiting senior adults, provide for appointment, powers,and duties of guardians ad litem, and change provisions of the Public Guardianship Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide a penalty for exploiting senior adults, provide for appointment, powers,and duties of guardians ad litem, and change provisions of the Public Guardianship Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-20LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB1008 amended into LB934 by AM2190
2016-04-20LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB1007 amended into LB934 by AM2276
2016-04-20LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 18, 2016
2016-04-12LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 12, 2016
2016-04-12LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2016-04-12LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1
2016-04-12LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2016-04-12LegislatureHadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate withdrawn
2016-04-07LegislatureHadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate filed
2016-03-21LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST67
2016-03-17LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2016-03-17LegislatureCoash AM2544 adopted
2016-03-17LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER178 adopted
2016-03-15LegislatureCoash AM2544 filed
2016-03-10LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER178 filed
2016-03-10LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER178
2016-03-07LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2016-03-07LegislatureCoash AM2276 adopted
2016-03-07LegislatureJudiciary AM2190 adopted
2016-02-25LegislatureCoash AM2276 filed
2016-02-18LegislatureJudiciary AM2190 filed
2016-02-18LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2190
2016-02-18LegislatureCoash priority bill
2016-01-27LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 03, 2016
2016-01-14LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2016-01-12LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback