NE LB931 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change a harvested products maximum weight overload exception under the Nebraska Rules of the Road
Title
Change a harvested products maximum weight overload exception under the Nebraska Rules of the Road
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-31 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM2128 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM2128 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020 |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on July 31, 2020 |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Cavanaugh FA133 withdrawn |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Cavanaugh FA133 filed |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2020-07-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2020-03-04 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM2128 adopted |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM2128 filed |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2128 |
2020-02-21 | Legislature | Hughes priority bill |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2020 |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |