NE LB929 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State rights of Nebraska National Guard members and provide that a residential address may be withheld from the public
Title
State rights of Nebraska National Guard members and provide that a residential address may be withheld from the public
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-03-12 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2350 filed |
2018-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2350 |
2018-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2018 |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34540 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB929.pdf |