NE LB92 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB282 amended into LB92 by AM609
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB282 amended into LB92 by AM609
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Require health carriers to provide coverage for telehealth services and change telehealth provisions relating to children's behavioral health
Title
Require health carriers to provide coverage for telehealth services and change telehealth provisions relating to children's behavioral health
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB282 amended into LB92 by AM609 |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 24, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST5 |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Riepe AM609 adopted |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Riepe AM609 filed |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Briese name added |
2017-03-07 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2017-03-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-03-06 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM253 adopted |
2017-02-23 | Legislature | Kolterman priority bill |
2017-02-16 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM253 filed |
2017-02-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM253 |
2017-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |