NE LB916 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit retaliation under the Nebraska Wage Payment Collection Act and the Wage and Hour Act
Title
Prohibit retaliation under the Nebraska Wage Payment Collection Act and the Wage and Hour Act
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2018 |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34056 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB916.pdf |