NE LB911 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB911 amended into LB1012 by AM2000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB911 amended into LB1012 by AM2000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the grant amount for the 211 Information and Referral Network
Title
Change the grant amount for the 211 Information and Referral Network
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-21 - Legislature - Friesen MO130 prevailed (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB911 amended into LB1012 by AM2000 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2022 |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2022 (cancel) |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Friesen MO130 prevailed |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Friesen MO130 pending |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Friesen MO130 Suspend rules to permit cancellation of hearing filed |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Rereferred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2022 |
2022-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |