NE LB910 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB910 amended into LB1094 by AM2721
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB910 amended into LB1094 by AM2721
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the Office of Parole Administration, restrictive housing provided by correctional services, and ineligibility of certain felons for benefits as prescribed
Title
Change provisions relating to the Office of Parole Administration, restrictive housing provided by correctional services, and ineligibility of certain felons for benefits as prescribed
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB910 amended into LB1094 by AM2721 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB690 amended into LB910 by AM2469 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Groene AM2716 filed |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Kintner AM2689 filed |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Bolz MO224 failed |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Bolz MO224 Invoke cloture filed |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2715 pending |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2715 filed |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2651 withdrawn |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Bloomfield MO223 failed |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Bloomfield MO223 Reconsider the vote on AM2624 filed |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Groene AM2624 lost |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Groene AM2624 pending |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER182 adopted |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2651 filed |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Groene AM2624 filed |
2016-03-15 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER182 filed |
2016-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER182 |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2469 adopted |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Motion to overrule Chair failed |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Chair ruled AM2469 is germane to bill |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2469 pending |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2469 filed |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Bolz AM2477 adopted |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Bolz AM2477 filed |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2328 lost |
2016-03-01 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2328 filed |
2016-03-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2328 |
2016-02-17 | Legislature | Judiciary priority bill |
2016-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2016 |
2016-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28561 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB910.pdf |