NE LB902 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Approved by Governor on April 07, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Approved by Governor on April 07, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change the Nebraska Clean-burning Motor Fuel Development Act
Title
Change the Nebraska Clean-burning Motor Fuel Development Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 07, 2016 |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 01, 2016 |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2016-03-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-03-23 | Legislature | Kolowski AM2671 adopted |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Kolowski AM2671 filed |
2016-03-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-03-18 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM2287 adopted |
2016-02-25 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM2287 filed |
2016-02-25 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2287 |
2016-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2016 |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2016-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |