NE LB901 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB931 amended into LB901 by AM2233
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB931 amended into LB901 by AM2233
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for psychology internships and change duties of the Behavioral Health Education Center and adopt the Nebraska Mental Health First Aid Training Act
Title
Provide for psychology internships and change duties of the Behavioral Health Education Center and adopt the Nebraska Mental Health First Aid Training Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB931 amended into LB901 by AM2233 |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 02, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 43-0-6 |
2014-03-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST50 |
2014-03-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-03-06 | Legislature | Bolz AM2233 adopted |
2014-03-06 | Legislature | Bolz AM2233 filed |
2014-03-06 | Legislature | Bolz AM2107 withdrawn |
2014-03-06 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER143 adopted |
2014-02-28 | Legislature | Bolz AM2107 filed |
2014-02-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER143 filed |
2014-02-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER143 |
2014-02-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-02-24 | Legislature | McGill AM2033 adopted |
2014-02-21 | Legislature | McGill AM2033 filed |
2014-02-20 | Legislature | McGill priority bill |
2014-02-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2014-01-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2014 |
2014-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |