NE LB894 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB893 amended into LB894 by AM1962
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB893 amended into LB894 by AM1962
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to juveniles
Title
Change provisions relating to juveniles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB893 amended into LB894 by AM1962 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB845 amended into LB894 by AM1962 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB709 amended into LB894 by AM1962 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB673 amended into LB894 by AM2610 |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 07, 2016 |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 01, 2016 |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2016-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST75 |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Krist AM2700 adopted |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Krist AM2700 filed |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Hughes AM2666 withdrawn |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2629 withdrawn |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Krist MO221 withdrawn |
2016-03-22 | Legislature | Krist MO221 Bracket until April 20, 2016 filed |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Hughes AM2666 filed |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM2654 adopted |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM2654 filed |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2629 pending |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2629 filed |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Chambers MO215 withdrawn |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Chambers MO215 Recommit to Judiciary Committee filed |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Coash AM2621 withdrawn |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Coash AM2621 filed |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Coash AM2616 adopted |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Coash AM2556 withdrawn |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Chambers AM2630 adopted |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Chambers AM2630 filed |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Krist AM2610 adopted |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Howard AM2600 adopted |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER181 adopted |
2016-03-16 | Legislature | Coash AM2616 filed |
2016-03-16 | Legislature | Coash AM2556 filed |
2016-03-16 | Legislature | Krist AM2610 filed |
2016-03-16 | Legislature | Howard AM2600 filed |
2016-03-15 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER181 filed |
2016-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER181 |
2016-03-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-03-08 | Legislature | Krist AM2456 adopted |
2016-03-08 | Legislature | Krist AM2456 filed |
2016-03-08 | Legislature | Coash AM2321 withdrawn |
2016-03-08 | Legislature | Coash AM2053 withdrawn |
2016-03-08 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1962 adopted |
2016-02-29 | Legislature | Coash AM2321 filed |
2016-02-17 | Legislature | Judiciary priority bill |
2016-02-10 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1962 filed |
2016-02-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1962 |
2016-02-10 | Legislature | Coash AM2053 filed |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 20, 2016 |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |