NE LB893 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB893 amended into LB1002 by AM2774
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB893 amended into LB1002 by AM2774
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to emergency care providers and provide for community paramedicine and critical care paramedics
Title
Change provisions relating to emergency care providers and provide for community paramedicine and critical care paramedics
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB893 amended into LB1002 by AM2774 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2020 |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41112 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB893.pdf |