NE LB892 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit restraining animals in the event of certain natural or manmade disasters or severe weather events as prescribed
Title
Prohibit restraining animals in the event of certain natural or manmade disasters or severe weather events as prescribed
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Howard [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2018 |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34072 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB892.pdf |