NE LB89 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 13 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB335 amended into LB89 by AM1009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 13 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB335 amended into LB89 by AM1009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to aid to dependent children and create the Intergenerational Poverty Task Force
Title
Change provisions relating to aid to dependent children and create the Intergenerational Poverty Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause stricken 30-15-4 (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Legislature - Failed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 31-16-2 (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Legislature - Failed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 31-16-2 (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB335 amended into LB89 by AM1009 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB89 amended into LB607 by AM1551 |
2015-05-07 | Legislature | Communication |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Returned by Governor without approval on April 29, 2015 |
2015-04-28 | Legislature | Smith explanation of vote |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 23, 2015 |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | Correctly enrolled |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause stricken 30-15-4 |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | Failed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 31-16-2 |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2015-04-14 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST23 |
2015-04-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-04-13 | Legislature | Mello AM1009 adopted |
2015-03-25 | Legislature | Mello AM1009 filed |
2015-03-20 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2015-03-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-03-11 | Legislature | Campbell priority bill |
2015-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2015 |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks name added |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |