NE LB889 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change appeal provisions under the Administrative Procedure Act
Title
Change appeal provisions under the Administrative Procedure Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-31 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Hilgers AM2690 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Hilgers AM2690 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020 |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on July 31, 2020 |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2020-07-23 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Hilgers AM2690 adopted |
2020-03-05 | Legislature | Hilgers AM2690 filed |
2020-02-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2020-01-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2020 |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2020-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |