NE LB88 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protect free speech rights of student journalists and student media advisers
Title
Protect free speech rights of student journalists and student media advisers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Legislature - Morfeld MO36 failed (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Legislature - Erdman AM662 adopted (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 28 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Legislature - Morfeld MO14 prevailed (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Legislature - Albrecht AM660 lost (Y: 15 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - Legislature - Halloran AM690 lost (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Legislature - Clements AM654 lost (Y: 15 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - Legislature - Erdman AM662 adopted (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 28 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Legislature - Morfeld MO14 prevailed (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Legislature - Albrecht AM660 lost (Y: 15 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - Legislature - Halloran AM690 lost (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Legislature - Clements AM654 lost (Y: 15 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Murman AM657 filed |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Groene AM796 filed |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA23 filed |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Morfeld MO36 failed |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Morfeld MO36 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Section 10 filed |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA25 pending |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Murman AM661 pending |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA25 filed |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA24 withdrawn |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA24 filed |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Murman AM661 pending |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Erdman AM662 adopted |
2021-03-22 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2021-03-18 | Legislature | Murman AM661 filed |
2021-03-18 | Legislature | Erdman AM662 filed |
2021-03-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-03-18 | Legislature | Albrecht AM660 lost |
2021-03-18 | Legislature | Morfeld MO14 prevailed |
2021-03-18 | Legislature | Morfeld MO14 Invoke cloture filed |
2021-03-18 | Legislature | Halloran AM690 lost |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | Albrecht AM660 filed |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | Halloran AM690 pending |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | Halloran AM690 filed |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | Clements AM654 lost |
2021-03-16 | Legislature | Clements AM654 pending |
2021-03-16 | Legislature | Clements AM654 filed |
2021-03-11 | Legislature | Morfeld priority bill |
2021-03-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | Flood name added |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2021-02-02 | Legislature | Slama name added |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 29, 2021 |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. name added |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |