NE LB88 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB425 amended into LB88 by AM705
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB425 amended into LB88 by AM705
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact and the Nurse Licensure Compact and change and eliminate other provisions relating to the regulation of health professionals
Title
Adopt the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact and the Nurse Licensure Compact and change and eliminate other provisions relating to the regulation of health professionals
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB425 amended into LB88 by AM705 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB343 amended into LB88 by AM810 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB342 amended into LB88 by AM705 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB283 amended into LB88 by AM705 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB61 amended into LB88 by AM705 |
2017-04-25 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 24, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST8 |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Schumacher AM864 adopted |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Schumacher AM864 filed |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Blood AM810 adopted |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER26 adopted |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Blood AM810 filed |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER26 filed |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER26 |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Riepe AM705 adopted |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Riepe AM705 filed |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM391 adopted |
2017-03-01 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM391 filed |
2017-03-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM391 |
2017-02-23 | Legislature | Halloran name added |
2017-02-23 | Legislature | Blood priority bill |
2017-02-22 | Legislature | Crawford name added |
2017-02-21 | Legislature | Linehan name added |
2017-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 15, 2017 |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |